open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:20-70404-
    Party Name:David Weaver, Sr and Wanda Weaver
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:August 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset Individual]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Employee Income Records]
    Date Published:August 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Petition Completed]
    Date Published:August 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:August 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [none]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
    Date Published:August 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Swope, Lisa M. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 7 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7]
    Date Published:August 08, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.pawb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?369770
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =