open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania

PENNSYLVANIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
    Case Number:1:20-bk-02391-
    Party Name:Aimee Marie Hartman and Lawrence Drew Hartman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Employee Income Records (Certification of NO Payment Advices or Pay Stubs or Pay Advices)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Chapter 13 - Statement of Your Current Monthly Income and Calculation Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107) or (Form 207) (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Schedules A-J and/or Summary of Assets and Liabilities (do NOT use this for Amendments)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Plan (Ch. 13) (NOT to be used for Amended Plans)]
    Date Published:September 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (Notice of Rescheduled or Reconvened 341 Meeting)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors Rescheduled (failure to file required documents - Ch. 13)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Extend Time]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Request for Notices under 2002]
    Date Published:August 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [BNC Certificate of Notice (341 Meeting Notice (Chapter 13))]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Order on Application To Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Meeting of Creditors (Ch. 7 and 13)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Automatic Assignment-Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certification of Execution of Rights and Responsibilities Agreement (LBF 2016-2(a))]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) (Do NOT select this event with other events)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Creditor List Uploaded (docket event previously named Matrix Filed)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: DeHart,, III (Trustee) Charles J [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:August 09, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.pamb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?269195
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =