U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-mj-00312-2
  • Case Name: USA v. ROBINSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 07, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order for Writ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint]
  • March 01, 2022: [Arrest - Rule 40]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.