U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00326-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MALCOLM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Arrest]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order for Writ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.