U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-00769-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEREZ-ACOSTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 09, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 16, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 16, 2022: [Arrest]
  • May 13, 2022: [Letter to Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.