U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BRYANT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • October 04, 2022: [Transcript - PDF]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • July 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 06, 2022: [Arrest]
  • July 05, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.