U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-00697
  • Case Name: U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PA v. HAWES et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order]
  • July 14, 2022: [Application for Writ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.