U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01290-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUMZEAH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 24, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order for Writ]
  • August 18, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.