U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01379-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEWIS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 26, 2022: [Arrest]
  • September 20, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 16, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • September 15, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order for Writ]
  • September 01, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.