U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mc-00867
  • Case Name: NEF HOLDINGS, LLC v. INTERSTATE NDT, INC.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • November 07, 2022: [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Clerk's Entry of Judgment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Complaint in Confession of Judgment (for Clerk of Court Personnel Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.