U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01547-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LEE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 14, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • October 13, 2022: [Letter to Unseal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.