U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-mj-01802-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CAMACHO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 15, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Pretrial Detention]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 14, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2022: [Arrest]
  • November 10, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order for Writ]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.