U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TYLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 13, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 13, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 13, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 13, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.