U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cv-00329
  • Case Name: Nourashrafeddin v. FAIRMONT PITTSBURGH
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [Correct]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 31, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.