U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-22952-
  • Case Name: Marc A. Eberle and Stephanie A. Amendola
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Confirming Ch 13 Plan - Final Basis]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Meeting Held - virtual ALL JUDGES - CHAPTER 13 ONLY]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Schedule - Judge Bohm]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Amended Schedules A B C G H I J]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Update Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing-bk]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [none]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Winnecour, Ronda J. [Transfer of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.