U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DOUGHERTY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 22, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 21, 2025: [Transcript - PDF]
  • April 18, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 18, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript - PDF]
  • April 03, 2025: [Response]
  • April 02, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript - PDF]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum and/or Opinion Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Memorandum and/or Opinion]
  • March 19, 2025: [Letter]
  • March 14, 2025: [Strike]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.