U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00319-6
  • Case Name: USA v. SANTANA BORIS, ET AL.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Seal (Public Entry - Judicial Document)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Document]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 19, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.