U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ-GARCIA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Memorandum Opinion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.