U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ABDUL-HADI, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Telephone Conference]
  • April 30, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Deadlines]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 18, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 18, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 18, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 18, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 14, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.