U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOOKSHAR
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 03, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Response/Briefing Schedule]
  • March 17, 2025: [Suppress]
  • March 17, 2025: [Discovery]
  • March 17, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • March 14, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.