U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GEER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.