U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ESPINOSA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 18, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.