U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ-BONILLA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.