U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VEGA-GUERRA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 02, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Superseding Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.