U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00255-2
  • Case Name: USA v. FAULKNER., ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • May 02, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sever]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exclude]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.