U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00097-2
  • Case Name: USA v. NUNLEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • April 01, 2025: [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.