U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VERAS-REGALADO et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Report of Speedy Trial Delay]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 19, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 19, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 19, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.