U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00385-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOLLOWAY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 20, 2025: [Sentencing Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.