U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURNETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Required)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • March 21, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 20, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.