U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00108-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAMIREZ FRIAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • April 15, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.