U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BELEN-PAREDES
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.