U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MILLIGAN et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Order Revoking Bond]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 26, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Revoke]
  • March 20, 2025: [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.