U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. AMERMAN., et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion or Complaint)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.