U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00111-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEARING
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 24, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 24, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.