U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice re: Cancellation of Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • April 04, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 03, 2025: [Continue]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.