U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00104-2
  • Case Name: USA v. VARGAS-PELLICCIA, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 25, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 25, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 24, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.