U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 07, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Leave to File Documents Under Seal]
  • April 04, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 03, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.