U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-cr-00342-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LUGO-VARGAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • April 07, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.