U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONTRERAS-ALBALADEJO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 31, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.