U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00649-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SARITA-GUZMAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of US Passport]
  • April 24, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 24, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 16, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 28, 2025: [Arrest]
  • March 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order for Writ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.