U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-mj-00637-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUOX
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Pretrial Conference]
  • April 16, 2025: [Probable Cause Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arrest]
  • April 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.