U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00437-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NICASIO-SALCEDO, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • May 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • May 01, 2025: [Plea Memorandum]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Jury Verdict Sheet]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stipulation to Jury]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum (NOT SENTENCING MEMORANDUM)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.