U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-cr-00120-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HARDY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.