U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00115-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SOWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other) (DO NOT USE FOR NOTICE OF APPEAL)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 26, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Dentention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • March 26, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Letter to Unseal]
  • March 26, 2025: [Indictment Unsealed]
  • March 26, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.