U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00002-3
  • Case Name: USA v. DIAZ-GIBSON, JR. et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Pre-Plea Presentence Investigation Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.