U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00252-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUTRIEUILLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Judgment]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Cancelling Deadline ]
  • April 11, 2025: [Postpone and/or Reschedule]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Tentative Findings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.