U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCKENZIE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • May 01, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [MAG Oral Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [MAG Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Extension Of Time To File Pretrial Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • March 27, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.