U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00111-2
  • Case Name: USA v. TOSON., ET AL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Plea Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Document]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.