U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ASTUDILLO ESTRADA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order re Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Inspection of PSI]
  • April 22, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.