U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania

pennsylvania Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KYLE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Seal Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order for Writ]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order for Warrant]
  • March 28, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.